SC S0546 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Fix Wednesday, March 3, 2021, At Noon, As The Date And Time For The House Of Representatives And The Senate To Meet In Joint Session In The Hall Of The House Of Representatives To Elect A Member Of The Lander University Board Of Trustees To Fill The Term Of The At-large Seat 9, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2022; To Elect A Member Of The South Carolina State University Board Of Trustees For The At-large Seat 10, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2024; To Elect A Member Of The Citadel Board Of Visitors, At-large Seat, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2026; And To Elect A Member Of The University Of South Carolina Board Of Trustees To Fill The Term Of The Member Of The Fifth Judicial Circuit, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To elect college trustees March 3, 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, adopted, sent to House

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback