SC S0545 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 12-39-70, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Appraisal And Assessment Of Personal Property, So As To Require The County Auditor To Use A Specific Form; To Amend Section 12-6-40, As Amended, Relating To The Application Of The Internal Revenue Code To State Income Tax Laws, So As To Update The Reference To The Internal Revenue Code To The Year 2019, To Provide That If The Internal Revenue Code Sections Adopted By This State Are Extended, Then These Sections Also Are Extended For South Carolina Income Tax Purposes, And To Specifically Not Adopt Certain Tax Provisions; And To Specify The Tax Consequences Of A Paycheck Protection Program Loan And The Expense Thereof. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property assessment of merchants and other businesses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 57) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-28 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 155
2020-09-22HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
2020-09-22HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2020-09-22SenateReturned to House with amendments
2020-09-22SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2020-09-22SenateHouse amendment amended
2020-09-22HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2020-09-16HouseRoll call Yeas-63 Nays-0
2020-09-16HouseRead second time
2020-09-16HouseAmended
2020-09-15HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2020-03-11HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-03-11HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-03-10SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-03-04SenateRoll call Ayes-46 Nays-0
2020-03-04SenateRead second time
2020-03-04SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-02-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-02-20SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
123970(n/a)See Bill Text
12640(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0545&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/545_20190220.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/545_20200205.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/545_20200304.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/545_20200915.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/545_20200916.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/545_20200922.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17351
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17890
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17956
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17985

Bill Comments

feedback