SC S0537 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Authorize The Greenville Young Men's Christian Association To Use The Senate Chamber And Any Available Committee Hearing Rooms In The Gressette Building On Thursday, November 19, 2015, And Friday, November 20, 2015, To Conduct The Youth In Government Program.
Title
Youth in Government Program, Greenville YMCA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Invitations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Polled out of committee Invitations |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Invitations |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
H3804 (Similar To) 2015-03-17 - Introduced and adopted
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0537&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/537_20150310.htm |