SC S0533 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 209
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibit The Use Of Section 14(c) Of The Fair Labor Standards Act Of 1938 To Pay Subminimum Wages To Individuals With Disabilities; To Provide Definitions; And To Enact The "employment First Initiative Act", So As To Define Terms, Encourage State Agencies And Political Subdivisions To Encourage Competitive Employment For Individuals With Disabilities, To Create The South Carolina Employment First Oversight Commission, And To Outline Its Duties And Obligations. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subminimum wages prohibited

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number Rfh-2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-01 Act No. 209
2022-06-01 Effective date 05/23/22
2022-05-23 Signed By Governor
2022-05-18 Ratified R 237
2022-05-12HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-2
2022-05-12HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2022-05-11SenateReturned to House with amendments
2022-05-11SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2022-05-11SenateHouse amendment amended
2022-05-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-05-05HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2022-05-04HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-4
2022-05-04HouseRead second time
2022-05-04HouseAmended
2022-05-02 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-04-28HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-08SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2021-04-08SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-04-08SenateAmended
2021-04-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-04-07SenateRead second time
2021-04-07SenateAmended
2021-04-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-02-09SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0533&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/533_20210209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/533_20210406.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/533_20210407.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/533_20210408.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/533_20210408A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/533_20220428.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/533_20220502.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/533_20220504.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/533_20220505.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/533_20220511.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0533%202021-02-09%20introduced.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19155
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21170
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21400
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21486
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21487

Bill Comments

feedback