SC S0533 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Veto sustained Ayes-0 Nays-35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Veto sustained Ayes-0 Nays-35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Qualifying Investment Of At Least Twenty Million Dollars May Begin At Any Time Period After December 31, 2008, And All Or A Portion May Occur Before The Taxpayer Notifies The Department Of Revenue Of Its Intention
Title
Sales and use tax exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate: to override the veto (Y: 0 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Veto sustained Ayes-0 Nays-35 | |
2011-04-12 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Ratified R 17 | |
2011-03-31 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2011-03-30 | Read second time | |
2011-03-29 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference | |
2011-03-23 | Roll call Ayes-30 Nays-10 | |
2011-03-23 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-03-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-03-10 | Roll call Ayes-29 Nays-9 | |
2011-03-10 | Read second time | |
2011-03-10 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3695 (Similar To) 2011-02-16 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means