SC S0532 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize May 2019 As "mental Health Month" In South Carolina In Order To Raise Awareness And Understanding Of Mental Illness And The Need For Appropriate And Accessible Services For All Individuals With Mental Illness.
Title
Mental Health Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-03-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Polled out of committee Medical Affairs |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced |