SC S0532 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Fix Wednesday, April 5, 2017, At Noon, As The Date And Time For The House Of Representatives And The Senate To Meet In Joint Session In The Hall Of The House Of Representatives For The Purpose Of Electing An At-large Member Of The Board Of Visitors Of The Citadel For A Term To Expire June 30, 2023; For The Purpose Of Electing A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University From The Second Congressional District, Seat 2, For A Term To Expire June 30, 2021; A Member From The Fourth Congressional District, Seat 4, For A Term To Expire June 30, 2021; From The Sixth Congressional District, Seat 6, For A Term To Expire June 30, 2021, And At-large Members From Seats 8, 10, 12, 14, And 15, Respectively, All For Terms To Expire June 30, 2021; For The Purpose Of Electing A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of The College Of Charleston To Fill The Term Of The Member From The Third Congressional District, Seat 6, For A Term To Expire June 30, 2020; For The Purpose Of Electing A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Lander University To Fill The Term Of The Member From At-large Seat 10, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2018; For The Purpose Of Electing Members Of The Board Of Trustees Of The Medical University Of South Carolina To Fill The Terms Of The Health Profession Members From The Third And Sixth Congressional Districts Whose Terms Will Expire June 30, 2018; For The Purpose Of Electing An At-large Member From Seat 8 From Winthrop University For A Term To Expire June 30, 2023; And For The Purpose Of Electing Four At-large Members Of The Board Of Trustees Of The Wil Lou Gray Opportunity School, All For Terms To Expire June 30, 2021; And For The Purpose Of Electing An At-large Member Of The Legislative Audit Council Pursuant To Section 2-15-10 From Among The Candidates Nominated By The Legislative Audit Council Nominating Committee Pursuant To Section 2-15-20, For A Term To Expire On June 30, 2023.
Title
At-Large Member of the Legislative Audit Council elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2017-03-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Invitations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Polled out of committee Invitations |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Invitations |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced |