SC S0499 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "south Carolina Election Commission Restructuring Act"; To Amend Chapter 1, Title 7 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Elections, By Adding Section 7-1-110, To Provide That The President Of The Senate And Speaker Of The House Of Representatives Have The Right To Intervene And Have Standing On Behalf Of Their Respective Bodies In Actions That Challenge The Validity Of An Election Law, An Election Policy, Or The Manner In Which An Election Is Conducted; To Amend Section 7-3-10(a) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The State Election Commission, To Provide That The Membership Of The Commission Consists Of Five Members Appointed By The Governor Upon The Advice And Consent Of The Senate; And To Amend Section 7-3-20(a) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Executive Director Of The State Election Commission, To Revise His Procedure Of Appointment.
Title
SC Election Commission Restructuring Act
Sponsors
Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Rex Rice [R] | Sen. Scott Talley [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] |
Sen. Wes Climer [R] | Sen. Joshua Kimbrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-7 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment Withdrawn |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Hutto, Young, McLeod, Garrett |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 1 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 3 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 3 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |