SC S0498 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Designate The Month Of May 2017 As "mental Health Month" In South Carolina In Order To Raise Awareness And Understanding Of Mental Illness And The Need For Appropriate And Accessible Services For All People With Mental Illness.
Title
Mental Health Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |