SC S0483 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Direct The Treasurer To Disburse Certain Funds To The Town Of Nichols For Recovery Expenses Associated With The Aftermath Of Hurricane Matthew.
Title
Town of Nichols SC
Sponsors
Sen. Kent Williams [D] | Sen. Gerald Malloy [D] | Sen. Nikki Setzler [D] | Sen. Vincent Sheheen [D] |
Sen. Greg Hembree [R] | Sen. Luke Rankin [R] | Sen. John Scott [D] | Sen. Kevin Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-17 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |