SC S0480 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 1, Chapter 3, Title 23 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division, By Adding Section 23-3-90, To Provide That An Agency Authorized To Conduct Fingerprint Background Checks In This State May Conduct A Federal Fingerprint Review, To Provide That The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division, Upon Request, May Submit The Fingerprints Collected By Agencies And Information Related To Those Prints To The Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Next Generation Identification Program, To Provide That The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division And The Federal Bureau Of Investigation May Retain Collected Fingerprints And Search Any Retained Fingerprints At A Later Date Pursuant To An Appropriate Inquiry, And To Provide That The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division May Charge A Reasonable Fee For The Collection And Retention Of The Fingerprints.
Title
Fingerprint background checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |