SC S0480 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Definitions Concerning The State Athletics Commission, To Define "commission Designee"; To Amend Section 40-81-260, Relating To Boxing Licenses, To Raise The Maximum Age For Applicants From Thirty-five To Forty, To Delete The Requirement That A Supermajority Vote Of The Commission Is Necessary To Waive The Age Requirement, And To Provide That The Commission Designee May Waive The Age Requirement; To Amend Section 40-81-265, Relating To Toughman Contestants And Off The Street Boxing Licenses, To Raise The Maximum Age For Licensure From Thirty-five To Forty; To Amend Section 40-81-270, Relating To Requirements For Promoter's Representatives Of Female Boxers, To Delete Requirements Concerning Examinations Mandated Annually And Before Each Contest; To Amend Section 40-81-280, Relating To Licensure Requirements For Professional Kickboxers And Mixed Martial Arts Contestants, To Raise The Maximum Age For Applicants From Thirty-five To Forty, To Delete The Requirement That A Supermajority Vote Of The Commission Is Necessary To Waive The Age Requirement, And To Provide That The Commission Designee May Waive The Age Requirement; And To Amend Section 40-81-290, Relating To Requirements For Promoter's Representatives Of Female Kick Boxers, To Delete Requirements Concerning Examinations Mandated Annually And Before Each Contest.
Title
Athletic Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-04-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-1 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 81 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 81 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 81 | 265 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 81 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 81 | 280 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 81 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |