SC S0477 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Make Conforming Changes To Reflect The Change Of The Previous Commission To The Prosecution Coordination Division Within The Office Of The Attorney General.
Title
Prosecution Coordination Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Lourie, Bright, Coleman, Rose | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3439 (Similar To) 2011-02-17 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3666 (Similar To) 2011-02-15 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3969 (Similar To) 2011-03-29 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3666 (Similar To) 2011-02-15 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3969 (Similar To) 2011-03-29 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 5 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1525 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 560 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 3 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 3 | 546 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 35 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 11 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 770 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 17 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 21 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |