SC S0475 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 50-5-1705, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Catch Limits For Estuarine And Saltwater Finfish, So As To Provide A Catch Limit For Tripletail; And To Amend Section 50-5-1710, Relating To Size Limits For Estuarine And Saltwater Finfish, So As To Provide A Minimum Size Limit For Tripletail. - Ratified Title
Title
Finfish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Act No. 119 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date 03/24/20 | |
2020-03-24 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-03-19 | Ratified R 121 | |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2020-02-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-3 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-05-08 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-05-07 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-8-19 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |