SC S0465 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That This Provision Also Applies To Violations Related To Harvesting And Handling Of Shellfish
Title
Shellfish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Act No. 30 | |
2017-05-17 | Effective date 05/10/17 | |
2017-05-10 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-09 | Ratified R 49 | |
2017-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-2 |
2017-05-04 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-2 |
2017-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2017-04-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 5 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 2500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 945 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 965 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 995 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 997 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |