SC S0463 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 40-43-86, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Facility Requirements For Pharmacies, The Presence Of Pharmacists-in-charge, Consultant Pharmacists, Prescription Drug Orders, The Transferring Of Prescriptions, The Substitution Of An Equivalent Drug Or Interchangeable Biological Product, Label Requirements, Patient Records And Counseling, Policies And Requirements For Automated Systems, Unlawful Practices, Sales To Optometrists And Home Medical Equipment Providers, The Code Of Ethics, The Sale Of Poisons And Returned Medications, Permit Fees, And Compounding Regulations And Restrictions, So As To Provide Pharmacists May Exercise Their Professional Judgment To Dispense Up To A Ninety-day Supply Of Medication For Each Refill Up To The Total Number Of Dosage Units As Authorized By The Prescriber On The Original Prescription, To Provide Certain Related Requirements, And To Provide Exceptions. - Ratified Title
Title
Pharmacists and prescriptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Act No. 38 | |
2019-05-17 | Effective date 05/13/19 | |
2019-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Ratified R 51 | |
2019-05-08 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-05-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2019-05-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-03-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |