SC S0461 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-1140, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Deductions From The Individual Income Tax, So As To Increase The Deduction For Certain Firefighters, Law Enforcement Officials, And Members Of The State Guard From Three Thousand Dollars To Six Thousand Dollars.
Title
Income tax deductions
Sponsors
Sen. Vincent Sheheen [D] | Sen. Michael Gambrell [R] | Sen. Thomas Alexander [R] | Sen. Richard Cash [R] |
Sen. Sandra Senn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |