SC S0459 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Define Certain Terms Related To The Use And Operation Of A Wireless Electronic Communication Device, To Provide That It Is Unlawful For A Person To Use A Wireless Electronic Communication Device To Compose, Send, Or Read A Text-based Communication While Operating A Motor Vehicle On The Public Highways Of This State, To Provide Exceptions To This Prohibition, To Provide A Penalty For A Violation Of This Section, To Provide That A Violation Of This Section Must Not Be Included In The Offender's Motor Vehicle Record Or Reported To His Motor Vehicle Insurer, To Provide That Law Enforcement Officers Shall Issue Only Warnings For Violations Of This Section During The First One Hundred Eighty Days After Its Effective Date, To Place Certain Restrictions On Law Enforcement Officers Who Enforce This Section, To Require The Department Of Public Safety To Maintain Statistical Information Regarding Citations Issued Pursuant To This Section, And To Provide That This Section Preempts All Ordinances, Regulations, And Resolutions Adopted By Local Governmental Entities Regarding Persons Using Wireless Electronic Communication Devices While Operating Motor Vehicles On The Public Highways Of This State
Title
Use of cellphone while operating a motor vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Rule 26b To Consider An Amendment On Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Rule 26b To Consider An Amendment On Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Act No. 260 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/09/14 | |
2014-06-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 270 | |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-2 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference report adopted |
2014-06-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-2 |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference report adopted |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Rankin, Sheheen, Massey |
2014-05-29 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Owens, Daning, Branham |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2014-05-21 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2014-05-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-6 |
2014-05-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-20 | House | Amended |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-2 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2014-02-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Coleman, Bennett, Johnson, Shealy |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Coleman, Nicholson, Bennett, Shealy |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0880 (Similar To) 2014-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary