SC S0456 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Article 1, Chapter 3, Title 23 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division, By Adding Section 23-3-90, To Provide That An Agency Authorized To Request A State Fingerprint Background Check May Request A Federal Fingerprint Background Check, To Provide That The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division, Upon Request, May Submit The Fingerprints Collected By Agencies And Information Related To Those Prints To The Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Next Generation Identification Program, To Provide That The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division And The Federal Bureau Of Investigation May Retain Collected Fingerprints And Search Any Retained Fingerprints At A Later Date Pursuant To An Appropriate Inquiry, And To Provide That The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division May Charge A Reasonable Fee For The Collection And Retention Of Fingerprints.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SLED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-04-06HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-03-23SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-03-17SenateRoll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
2021-03-17SenateRead second time
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-10SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-03-01SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23390(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback