SC S0455 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Act No. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, So As To Enact The "armed Services Members And Spouses Professional And Occupational Licensing Act" By Adding Section 27-1-170 So As To Provide Conditions Under Which Active Duty United States Armed Forces Members' Spouses Who Are Credentialed In Professions Or Occupations In Other Jurisdictions And Subsequently Relocate To This State Under Official Military Orders May Continue To Work In Such Professions Or Occupations In This State, And To Provide Related Requirements And Procedures For Implementing These Provisions, Among Other Things; To Amend Section 40-1-630, Relating To The Issuance Of Temporary Professional And Occupational Licenses By State Regulatory Boards, So As To Make The Issuance Of Such Temporary Licenses Mandatory In Certain Circumstances; To Amend Section 40-1-640, Relating To The Discretionary Acceptance Of Military Education, Training, And Experience To Satisfy Professional And Occupational Licensure Requirements Of Certain State Regulatory Boards, So As To Mandate The Acceptance Of Such Education, Training, And Experience In Certain Circumstances; And To Amend Section 40-33-20, As Amended, And Section 40-33-34, As Amended, Both Relating To Certification Requirements For Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists, So As To Revise Academic Requirements For Such Certification. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional licenses, temporary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-12 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 108 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number Rfh-3 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number Rfh-2b (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number Rfh-1 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28 Act No. 139
2020-05-26 Signed By Governor
2020-05-21 Ratified R 144
2020-05-12HouseOrdered enrolled for ratification
2020-05-12HouseRoll call Yeas-119 Nays-0
2020-05-12HouseConference report adopted
2020-02-27SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2020-02-27SenateConference report received and adopted
2020-01-28HouseConference committee appointed West, Caskey, Ott
2019-05-09SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Gambrell, Scott, Davis
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-0 Nays-108
2019-05-09HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2019-05-08SenateReturned to House with amendments
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-1
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2019-05-08SenateHouse amendment amended
2019-05-02HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-01HouseRoll call Yeas-96 Nays-0
2019-05-01HouseRead second time
2019-05-01HouseAmended
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-07SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-05SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-03-05SenateRead second time
2019-03-05SenateAmended
2019-02-14SenateCommittee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3263 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Amended

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
271170(n/a)See Bill Text
401630(n/a)See Bill Text
401640(n/a)See Bill Text
403320(n/a)See Bill Text
403334(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0455&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/455_20190129.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/455_20190214.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/455_20190305.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/455_20190430.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/455_20190501.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/455_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/455_20200512.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15775
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16610
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16836
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16763
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16764
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16765
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17273
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17717

Bill Comments

feedback