SC S0451 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize American Legion Auxiliary Palmetto Girls State To Use The Chambers Of The South Carolina Senate And House Of Representatives On Friday, June 16, 2023.
Title
Palmetto Girls State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduced |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Operations and Management |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Operations and Management |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced |