SC S0449 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 926 Of 1962, As Amended, Relating To The Composition Of The Aiken County Commission For Technical And Comprehensive Education, So As To Add Two Nonvoting Members; And To Amend Section 31-12-40, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Creation And Membership Of Redevelopment Authorities, So As To Include The Savannah River Site Redevelopment Authority. - Ratified Title
Title
Aiken County Commission for Technical Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 169 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/22 | |
2022-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 170 | |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-1 |
2022-05-05 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | Amended |
2022-05-05 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2022-05-04 | House | Debate adjourned on motion to reconsider |
2022-05-03 | House | Debate adjourned on motion to reconsider |
2022-04-28 | House | Debate adjourned on motion to reconsider |
2022-04-27 | House | Debate adjourned on motion to reconsider |
2022-04-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-1 |
2022-04-26 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Aiken Delegation |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Aiken Delegation |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |