SC S0443 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Add Turkey To The List Of Animals Covered By The Provisions Relating To The Unlawful Hunting Of Wildlife; And To Repeal Sections 50-11-708 And 50-11-720 Relating To The Use Of Artificial Lights To Observe Or Harass Wildlife And Penalties Associated With Night Hunting Of Deer And Bear
Title
Night hunting
Sponsors
Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Thomas Young [R] | Sen. Thomas McElveen [D] | Sen. Kent Williams [D] |
Sen. Thomas Corbin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 88 | |
2017-05-30 | Effective date 05/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 79 | |
2017-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2017-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2017-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 11 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 717 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 745 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 9 | 1120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |