SC S0434 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-23 - Act No. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-23 - Act No. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Suspend Provisos 21.11, 21.15, And 21.20 Of Part Ib, Act 291 Of 2010, The Fiscal Year 2010-2011 General Appropriations Bill And To Suspend A Portion Of Proviso 89.87 Of Part Ib, Act 291 Of 2010, Prohibiting The Department Of Health And Human Services From Reducing Provider Rates, To Provide That All Proposed Changes In Provider Rates Must Include Estimates Of The Projected Dollar Cost Savings By Source Of Funds And The Number Of Providers And Clients Impacted, And To Require Certain Reports Reconciling Actual Savings In Comparison To The Estimates
Title
Prohibiting DHHS from reducing provider rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House: Table Motion To Reconsider (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 26 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Table Motion to Reconsider (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 27 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Passage of Joint Resolution (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 39 (Y: 66 N: 41 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 38 (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 18 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 26 (Y: 60 N: 51 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 22 (Y: 67 N: 37 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment No. 21 (Y: 65 N: 39 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 17 (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 12 (Y: 66 N: 41 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 11 (Y: 70 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 6 (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 5 (Y: 67 N: 41 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Adjourn (Y: 39 N: 69 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Cloture (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 69 N: 40 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 67 N: 39 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment No. 21 (Y: 65 N: 39 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: adjourn (Y: 39 N: 69 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Cloture (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate (Y: 69 N: 39 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Waive Printing (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: waive printing (Y: 65 N: 42 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Table Motion to Reconsider (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 27 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Passage of Joint Resolution (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 39 (Y: 66 N: 41 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 38 (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 18 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 26 (Y: 60 N: 51 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 22 (Y: 67 N: 37 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment No. 21 (Y: 65 N: 39 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 17 (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 12 (Y: 66 N: 41 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 11 (Y: 70 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 6 (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 5 (Y: 67 N: 41 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Adjourn (Y: 39 N: 69 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Cloture (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 69 N: 40 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 67 N: 39 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Amendment No. 21 (Y: 65 N: 39 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: adjourn (Y: 39 N: 69 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Cloture (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate (Y: 69 N: 39 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Waive Printing (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: waive printing (Y: 65 N: 42 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-23 | Act No. 77 | |
2011-04-08 | Effective date 04/06/11 | |
2011-04-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Ratified R 15 | |
2011-04-05 | Roll call Yeas-63 Nays-44 | |
2011-04-05 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2011-03-31 | Roll call Yeas-67 Nays-45 | |
2011-03-31 | Read second time | |
2011-03-31 | Requests for debate-Rep | |
2011-03-31 | Objection by Rep. Cobb-Hunter | |
2011-03-29 | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Roll call Ayes-24 Nays-8 | |
2011-03-01 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-02-24 | Roll call Ayes-24 Nays-11 | |
2011-02-24 | Read second time | |
2011-02-24 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Special order, set for February 22, 2011 | |
2011-02-09 | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced and read first time |