SC S0428 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 7-7-80, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Designation Of Voting Precincts In Anderson County, So As To Delete The Grove School And Anderson 5/a Precincts And Add The South Fant Precinct, And To Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office. - Ratified Title
Title
Voting precincts; Anderson County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Act No. 7 | |
2019-03-27 | Effective date 03/20/19 | |
2019-03-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Ratified R 12 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-02-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 |
2019-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |