SC S0426 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establish A Mental Health Court Program, To Provide For A System That Diverts Mentally Ill Offenders To Appropriate Treatment Programs Rather Than Incarceration, To Define Necessary Terms, To Provide For Eligibility To Participate In Mental Health Court, To Provide That Existing Mental Health Courts Established Pursuant To An Administrative Order Of The Supreme Court Shall Continue In Existence, To Provide That Each Solicitor May Establish A Program, To Provide For Qualifications For Service As A Mental Health Court Judge, To Provide That Mental Health Court Judges Have The Same Protections From Civil Liability And Immunity As Other Judicial Officers In This State, And To Provide That Solicitors Who Accept State Funding For The Program Must Establish The Program Within One Hundred Eighty Days Of The Receipt Of Funding
Title
Mental Health Court Program Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Act No. 30 | |
2015-06-04 | Effective date 06/01/15 | |
2015-06-01 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-05-28 | Ratified R 53 | |
2015-05-13 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-2 |
2015-05-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Bennett, McElveen |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0209 (Similar To) 2015-02-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Bennett, McElveen
H3412 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan
H3412 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan