SC S0425 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 43-35-87 So As To Authorize Financial Institutions To Decline Certain Transaction Requests In Cases Of The Suspected Financial Exploitation Of Vulnerable Adults; By Adding Article 8 To Chapter 1, Title 35 So As To Authorize Financial Representatives Of Certain Clients, Including Vulnerable Adults, To Notify The Department Of Social Services And The Office Of The Attorney General In The Event Of A Suspected Financial Exploitation, To Provide Certain Protections For Good Faith Reporting, And For Other Purposes; And To Amend Section 35-1-607, Relating To Public Records Of The Office Of The Attorney General's Securities Division, So As To Add Certain Records Provided To The Division Regarding Suspected Financial Exploitation Of Vulnerable Adults. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult protection, investigations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 110 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Act No. 84
2021-06-01 Effective date 05/18/21
2021-05-18 Signed By Governor
2021-05-18 Ratified R 103
2021-05-13HouseOrdered enrolled for ratification
2021-05-12SenateSenate recedes from amendment
2021-05-12HouseRoll call Yeas-0 Nays-110
2021-05-12HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2021-05-06SenateReturned to House with amendments
2021-05-06SenateRoll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
2021-05-06SenateHouse amendment amended
2021-05-05HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2021-05-04HouseRoll call Yeas-97 Nays-0
2021-05-04HouseRead second time
2021-05-04HouseAmended
2021-05-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-04-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-04-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-07SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-03-31SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2021-03-31SenateRead second time
2021-03-31SenateAmended
2021-03-31SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-10SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351607(n/a)See Bill Text
433587(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0425&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/425_20210112.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/425_20210310.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/425_20210331.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/425_20210429.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/425_20210503.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/425_20210504.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/425_20210506.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/425_20210513.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0425%202021-01-12%20introduced.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19019
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19506
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19571
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19699

Bill Comments 750

feedback