SC S0423 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, Relating To Board Of Registration For Foresters, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4721, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Foresters Board of Registration (D. No. 4721)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |