SC S0415 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Promote Uniformity Among The State's Forty-six Probate Courts, To Safeguard Adequate Due Process Protections For The State's Alleged Incapacitated Individuals, To Eliminate Over Reliance Upon Restrictive Full Or Plenary Guardianships, To Reduce The Costs Of Proceedings, To Establish Consistency Between Guardianship And Conservatorship Proceedings, And To Create An Adequate System For Monitoring Guardians And Conservators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probate Court

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09 Signed By Governor
2017-05-04 Ratified R 34
2017-04-27HouseRead third time and enrolled
2017-04-26HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2017-04-26HouseRead second time
2017-04-25HouseRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-18HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-04-06SenateRead third time and sent to House
2017-04-05SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2017-04-05SenateRead second time
2017-03-22SenateCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Johnson, Turner, Climer, Goldfinch
2017-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3511 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
621112(n/a)See Bill Text
621302(n/a)See Bill Text
621401(n/a)See Bill Text
821800(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback