SC S0401 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Roll call Ayes-22 Nays-20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 6-1-320 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Limitation On Millage Increases, To Allow The Governing Body Of A County To Suspend The Limitation For The Purpose Of Supporting A Fire Protection District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Millage increases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 22 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateRoll call Ayes-22 Nays-20
2021-04-06SenateRead second time
2021-04-06SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-17SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3615 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61320(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback