SC S0401 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Act No. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 57-5-880 So As To Define Certain Terms, Provide An Entity Undertaking A Transportation Improvement Project Shall Bear The Costs Related To Relocating Water And Sewer Lines, To Provide The Requirements For Utilities To Be Eligible For Relocation Payments, And To Provide A Sunset Provision. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highway system construction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21 Act No. 36
2019-05-17 Effective date 05/13/19
2019-05-13 Signed By Governor
2019-05-09 Ratified R 49
2019-05-01HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-04-30HouseRoll call Yeas-108 Nays-0
2019-04-30HouseRead second time
2019-04-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-04-02HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-28SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-27SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2019-03-27SenateRead second time
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
575880(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback