SC S0401 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-18 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Remove A Limit On The Amount Of Funds Or Property That The Board May Transfer To The Corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Citadel Board of Visitors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2013-04-18HouseIntroduced and read first time
2013-04-17SenateRead third time and sent to House
2013-04-17 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-04-16SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2013-04-16SenateRead second time
2013-04-16SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2013-04-11SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education
2013-02-20SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2013-02-20SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5912155(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback