SC S0389 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Act No. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Act No. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Further Provide For The Manner In Which These Corporations Are Organized, Regulated, And Permitted To Operate
Title
Business Development Corporations
Sponsors
Sen. Joel Lourie [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 30 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 30 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | Act No. 60 | |
2015-06-11 | Effective date 06/04/15 | |
2015-06-04 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-06-03 | Ratified R 92 | |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-3 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2015-05-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-1 |
2015-05-27 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-27 | House | Amended |
2015-05-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-27-15 |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3785 (Similar To) 2015-03-05 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry