SC S0382 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fix Wednesday, February 6, 2019, Immediately Following The Elections For The Positions Named In The Concurrent Resolution In Which Candidates Screened By The Judicial Merit Selection Commission And The College And University Trustee Screening Commission, As The Time To Elect A Member Of The Public Service Commission For The Second Congressional District For A Term Expiring On June 30, 2022.
Title
Election of member on February 6, 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0382&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/382_20190116.htm |