SC S0381 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That An Active Member Who Is Terminated From Employment Within One Year Of Retirement Eligibility May Purchase Service Credit
Title
Leave and lump-sum payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Act No. 202 | |
2016-06-09 | Effective date 06/03/16 | |
2016-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 217 | |
2016-05-26 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-05-25 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-2 |
2016-05-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 11 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 1140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 11 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |