SC S0377 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize Palmetto Girls State To Use The Chambers Of The Senate And The House Of Representatives On Friday, June 16, 2017.
Title
Palmetto Girls' State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Invitations |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Polled out of committee Invitations |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Invitations |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced |