SC S0374 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]

Summary

Fix 12:00 Noon On Wednesday, February 1, 2023, As The Time To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Supreme Court, Seat 4, To Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire July 31, 2032; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2023; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 2, And The Successor Will Serve A New Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2029; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Fifteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, To Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2028; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 3, Upon His Retirement On Or Before December 31, 2023, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2027; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, First Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, To Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Expires June 30, 2028; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Twelfth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Upon His Retirement On Or Before December 31, 2023, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2025; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, At-large, Seat 7, Which Will Expire June 30, 2023; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, At-large, Seat 8, Which Will Expire June 30, 2023; And To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Administrative Law Court, Seat 5, Upon Her Retirement On Or Before June 30, 2023, And The Successor Will Serve A New Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2028.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JMSC Elections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 1 (Y: 2 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table The Adoption Of Am. 2 Amendment Number 2 (Y: 8 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-01-26HouseIntroduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
2023-01-25SenateAdopted, sent to House
2023-01-25SenateAmended
2023-01-25 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-01-24SenateCommittee report: Favorable Operations and Management
2023-01-24SenatePolled out of committee Operations and Management
2023-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Operations and Management
2023-01-12SenateIntroduced

Same As/Similar To

S0262 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Operations and Management

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback