SC S0374 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide A Time For Candidates To Obtain Pledges Or Commitments From Members Of The General Assembly After Publication Of The Joint Committee's Findings On The Candidates And To Set A Time For The Election Of The Candidates.
Title
Nonjudicial candidates
Sponsors
Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Kevin Bryant [R] | Sen. Danny Verdin [R] | Sen. Ronnie Cromer [R] |
Sen. Lee Bright [R] | Sen. Larry Martin [R] | Sen. Nikki Setzler [D] | Sen. John Courson [R] |
Sen. Gerald Malloy [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), S.Martin, Allen |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |