SC S0372 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation - Board Of Long Term Health Care Administrators, Relating To Administrator-in-training Program Requirements, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4722, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code
Title
Health Care Administrators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Act No. 110 | |
2017-05-12 | Effective date 5/9/17 | |
2017-05-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-04 | Ratified R 29 | |
2017-04-20 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-04-19 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2017-04-19 | House | Read second time |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-3 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |