SC S0366 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 42-15-60, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Time Period Medical Treatment And Supplies Are Furnished, So As To Clarify That Medical Treatment And Supplies Are Furnished For Any Additional Time That The Judgment Of The Workers' Compensation Commission Established, By The Preponderance Of Evidence Contained In The Medical Records Or By The Opinion Of A Medical Provider, Will Lessen The Period Of Disability; And To Amend Section 42-17-40, Relating To The Conduct Of A Workers' Compensation Commission Hearing So As To Provide That Medical Records And Opinions Of Medical Providers Are Admissible Without Regard To The Rules Of Evidence.
Title
Workers' comp
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: M.Johnson (ch), Sabb, Matthews, Garrett |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Young (ch), Sabb, Matthews, Garrett, M.Johnson |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |