SC S0365 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Act No. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That The Department Of Motor Vehicles Shall Issue "2016 Baseball National Champions" Special License Plates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special license plates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17 Act No. 5
2017-04-13 Effective date 4/5/17
2017-04-05 Signed By Governor
2017-04-04 Ratified R 11
2017-03-08HouseRead third time and enrolled
2017-03-07HouseRoll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
2017-03-07HouseRead second time
2017-03-02HouseRecalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2017-02-15HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-02-14SenateRead third time and sent to House
2017-02-09SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2017-02-09SenateRead second time
2017-02-09SenateAmended
2017-02-09SenateRecalled from Committee on Transportation
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-02-07SenateIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback