SC S0365 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

A Senate Resolution To Declare February 2015 As Teen Dating Violence Awareness Month Throughout South Carolina And To Urge The General Public To Work Toward Ending Teen Dating Violence By Empowering Young People To Develop Healthier Relationships, Assisting Victims In Accessing The Information And Supportive Services They Need, Creating Better And More Resources For Young People In Need, Instituting Effective Intervention And Prevention Policies In Schools, And Engaging In Discussions With Family Members And Peers To Promote Awareness And Prevention Of The Quiet Epidemic Of Teen Dating Violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teen Dating Violence Awareness Month

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-29SenateAdopted
2015-01-28SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2015-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-01-27SenateIntroduced

Same As/Similar To

S1053 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Adopted

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback