SC S0359 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allow A Pharmacy To Submit Records In An Electronic Format Or By Certified Mail And To Prohibit Certain Errors From Serving As The Sole Basis Of The Rejection Of A Claim; And To Repeal Article 20 Of Chapter 71, Title 38 Relating To Pharmacy Benefit Managers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefits managers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 68
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseAmended
2019-05-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-08HouseAmended
2019-05-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-07SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2019-03-07SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-07SenateAmended
2019-03-06 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-05SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2019-03-05SenateRead second time
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-02-28 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-27SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38210(n/a)See Bill Text
38711810(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0359&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190110.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190227.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190228.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190305.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190306.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190307.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190502.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190503.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190509.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/359_20190509A.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15785
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15840
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16769
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16852

Bill Comments

feedback