SC S0351 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allow An Income Tax Credit For Each Clinical Rotation Served By A Physician, Advanced Practice Nurse, Or Physician Assistant As A Preceptor For Certain Programs.
Title
Income tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-02-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3620 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow