SC S0347 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Malloy, Campsen, Massey
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Malloy, Campsen, Massey
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminate The Definition Of "appropriate Supervisory Office"; And To Repeal Sections 8-13-530, 8-13-540, And 8-13-550 All Relating To The House Of Representatives And Senate Ethics Committees.
Title
Ethics, Government Accountability and Campaign Reform Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Malloy, Campsen, Massey |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0013 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3407 (Similar To) 2013-01-23 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
H3407 (Similar To) 2013-01-23 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 13 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 540 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0347&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/347_20130206.htm |