SC S0345 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Include The Performance Of Telemedicine; And To Provide The Provisions Of This Act Take Effect July 1, 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced practice registered nurses, scope and standards of practice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31 Act No. 234
2018-05-30 Effective date 07/01/18
2018-05-18 Signed By Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 203
2018-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
2018-05-08HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2018-05-08SenateReturned to House with amendments
2018-05-08SenateHouse amendment amended
2018-05-03HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2018-05-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-05-02HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2018-05-02HouseRead second time
2018-05-02HouseAmended
2018-04-25HouseCommittee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-03-21HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-20SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-1
2018-03-20SenateRead third time and sent to House
2018-03-20SenateAmended
2018-03-15SenateRead second time
2018-03-14SenateAmended
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment Withdrawn
2018-03-06SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3772 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4033110(n/a)See Bill Text
403320(n/a)See Bill Text
403334(n/a)See Bill Text
403355(n/a)See Bill Text
403357(n/a)See Bill Text
403359(n/a)See Bill Text
403361(n/a)See Bill Text
403363(n/a)See Bill Text
403365(n/a)See Bill Text
403367(n/a)See Bill Text
4047110(n/a)See Bill Text
4047195(n/a)See Bill Text
404720(n/a)See Bill Text
4047370(n/a)See Bill Text
4047935(n/a)See Bill Text
4047955(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0345&session=122&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/345_20170201.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/345_20180306.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/345_20180314.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/345_20180320.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/345_20180321.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/345_20180425.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/345_20180502.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/345_20180503.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/345_20180508.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=14375
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=14963
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15061

Bill Comments

feedback