SC S0345 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on August 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-23 - Act No. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on August 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-23 - Act No. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Governing Body Of Any School District Of This State May Waive Up To Five School Days Missed By Students Attending Schools And Charter Schools Due To Inclement Weather During The 2010-2011 School Year From The Make-up Requirement That Full School Days Missed Due To Inclement Weather, Or Other Disruptions Be Made Up, And To Provide That For Any District Which Waives Days As Permitted Above, The Days Are Also Waived For Students Participating In Home School Programs Approved By The District Board Of Trustees Of The District In Which The Student Resides
Title
Snow days
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 1 (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-23 | Act No. 96 | |
2011-03-16 | Effective date 03/10/11 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed By Governor | |
2011-03-10 | Ratified R 6 | |
2011-02-23 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | Read second time | |
2011-02-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-02-17 | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-02-16 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-02-15 | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-6 | |
2011-02-15 | Read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-7 | |
2011-02-15 | Amended | |
2011-02-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-02-10 | Recalled from Committee on Education | |
2011-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced and read first time |