SC S0342 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 63-1-40, Relating To Children's Code Definitions, So As To Restate The Existing Definitions; And By Adding Section 63-1-45 So As To Define "unaccompanied Homeless Youth", "homeless Child Or Youth", And "youth At Risk Of Homelessness". - Ratified Title
Title
Homeless Youth Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Act No. 23 | |
2023-05-26 | Effective date 05/16/23 | |
2023-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Ratified R 30 | |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2023-04-27 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2023-04-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 |
2023-04-26 | House | Read second time |
2023-04-26 | House | Amended |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-02-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |