SC S0342 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Debate adjourned until Thurs., Sept 24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "responsible Alcohol Server Training Act"; To Amend Title 61 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Alcohol And Alcoholic Beverages, By Adding Chapter 3, To Provide For The Establishment, Implementation, And Enforcement Of A Mandatory Alcohol Server Training And Education Program, To Require Servers Of Alcoholic Beverages For On-premises Consumption In Licensed Or Permitted Businesses To Obtain Alcohol Server Certificates, To Provide Guidance For The Curricula Of The Training Programs, To Provide For The Department Of Revenue To Be Responsible For Approval Of The Training Programs And Implementation Of The Alcohol Server Certificates, To Require Fees From Providers Of Training Programs And From Applicants For Alcohol Server Certificates To Cover The Costs Of The Mandatory Training And Enforcement, To Require Coordination Among The Department Of Revenue, The State Law Enforcement Division, And Other State And Local Agencies For The Implementation And Enforcement Of These Provisions, And To Provide For Fines And Penalties For Violations Of These Provisions; To Amend Section 61-2-60 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Promulgation Of Regulations, To Authorize The Department Of Revenue To Promulgate Regulations Governing The Development, Implementation, Education, And Enforcement Of Responsible Alcohol Server Training Provisions; And To Amend Section 61-4-50, Section 61-4-90(a), Section 61-4-580, Section 61-6-2220, Section 61-6-4070(a), And Section 61-6-4080 Of The 1976 Code, All Relating To The Unlawful Sale Of Alcohol, To Provide For Fines And Penalties For Violations Of Certain Provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Responsible Alcohol Server Training Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseDebate adjourned until Thurs., Sept 24
2020-09-22HouseDebate adjourned until Wednesday, Sept. 23
2020-09-16HouseDebate adjourned until Thurs., 09-17-20
2020-09-16HouseDebate adjourned
2020-09-15HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 09-16-20
2020-05-12HouseRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-15HouseRecommitted to Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-11HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2019-04-10SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-04-10SenateAmended
2019-04-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-09SenateAmended
2019-04-09SenateCommittee Amendment Amended and Adopted
2019-04-03SenateRead second time
2019-03-28 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Turner (ch), Hutto, M.B.Matthews, Goldfinch, Talley
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61260(n/a)See Bill Text
61450(n/a)See Bill Text
614580(n/a)See Bill Text
61490(n/a)See Bill Text
6162220(n/a)See Bill Text
6164070(n/a)See Bill Text
6164080(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback