SC S0341 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require Every Hospital And Birth Center In The State To Provide Educational Information On Sickle Cell Disease And Sickle Cell Trait And Associated Complications To The Parents Of Each Newborn Baby Who Is At High Risk For Sickle Cell Disease Or Sickle Cell Trait Delivered In The Hospital Or Birth Center
Title
Renal medullary carcinoma
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Act No. 76 | |
2015-06-17 | Effective date 06/08/15 | |
2015-06-08 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-06-04 | Ratified R 106 | |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2015-06-04 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2015-06-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-77 Nays-2 |
2015-06-03 | House | Read second time |
2015-06-03 | House | Amended |
2015-05-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |